TX SB1817 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-25 - Left pending in committee
Pending: Senate Natural Resources & Economic Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-25 - Left pending in committee
Pending: Senate Natural Resources & Economic Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the deposit of the gas utility pipeline tax to the credit of the oil and gas regulation and cleanup fund.
Title
Relating to the deposit of the gas utility pipeline tax to the credit of the oil and gas regulation and cleanup fund.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-25 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Referred to Natural Resources & Economic Development |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Read first time |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Filed |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
Mines & Mineral Resources
Oil & Gas
State Finances
State Finances--Appropriations
Taxation
Taxation--Energy Resources
Utilities
Utilities--Natural Gas
Oil & Gas
State Finances
State Finances--Appropriations
Taxation
Taxation--Energy Resources
Utilities
Utilities--Natural Gas
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=SB1817 |
Text | http://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/SB01817I.htm |