TX SB1815 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 19 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-05-04 - Referred to Higher Education
Pending: House Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the eligibility of public institutions of higher education for formula funding for health-related institutions.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the eligibility of public institutions of higher education for formula funding for health-related institutions.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-19 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-19 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-04HouseReferred to Higher Education
2017-05-04HouseRead first time
2017-04-20HouseReceived from the Senate
2017-04-19SenateReported engrossed
2017-04-19SenateRecord vote
2017-04-19SenatePassed
2017-04-19SenateRead 3rd time
2017-04-19SenateRecord vote
2017-04-19SenateThree day rule suspended
2017-04-19SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-04-19SenateRead 2nd time & passed to engrossment
2017-04-19SenateLaid before the Senate
2017-04-19SenatePlaced on local & uncontested calendar
2017-04-11SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2017-04-11SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2017-04-11SenateReported favorably as substituted
2017-04-10SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-04-10SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-03-23SenateReferred to Finance
2017-03-23SenateRead first time
2017-03-09SenateFiled
2017-03-09SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback