TX SB18 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 6 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-17 - Left pending in committee
Pending: House Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to public institutions of higher education setting aside portions of designated tuition for student financial assistance.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to public institutions of higher education setting aside portions of designated tuition for student financial assistance.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-06 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 20 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-06 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 20 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - Senate - Vote recorded in Journal (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - Senate - FA3 Schwertner (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-04 - Senate - Record vote (Y: 17 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-04 - Senate - Amendment fails of adoption (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-04 - Senate - FA1 Seliger (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-04 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 26 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-17HouseLeft pending in committee
2017-05-17HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2017-05-17HouseConsidered in public hearing
2017-05-17HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-05-16HousePosting rule suspended
2017-05-01HouseReferred to Higher Education
2017-05-01HouseRead first time
2017-04-06HouseReceived from the Senate
2017-04-06SenateReported engrossed
2017-04-06SenateRecord vote
2017-04-06SenatePassed
2017-04-06SenateRead 3rd time
2017-04-06SenateRecord vote
2017-04-06SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2017-04-05SenateRecord vote
2017-04-05SenatePassed to engrossment as amended
2017-04-05SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-04-05SenateAmended
2017-04-05SenateAmendment(s) offered
2017-04-05SenateRecord vote
2017-04-05SenateAmended
2017-04-05SenateAmendment(s) offered
2017-04-05SenateVote reconsidered
2017-04-04SenateReason for vote recorded in Journal
2017-04-04SenateRecord vote
2017-04-04SenatePassed to engrossment as amended
2017-04-04SenateRecord vote
2017-04-04SenateAmendment fails of adoption
2017-04-04SenateAmendment(s) offered
2017-04-04SenateRecord vote
2017-04-04SenateAmended
2017-04-04SenateAmendment(s) offered
2017-04-04SenateRead 2nd time
2017-04-04SenateRecord vote
2017-04-04SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2017-04-04SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2017-04-03SenateNot again placed on intent calendar
2017-03-30SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2017-03-15SenateCo-author authorized
2017-03-14SenateNot again placed on intent calendar
2017-03-14SenateCo-author authorized
2017-03-13SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2017-02-22SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2017-02-22SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2017-02-22SenateTestimony taken in committee
2017-02-22SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-02-22SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-02-06SenateCo-author authorized
2017-01-31SenateCo-author authorized
2017-01-30SenateCo-author authorized
2017-01-24SenateReferred to Higher Education
2017-01-24SenateRead first time
2017-01-19SenateFiled
2017-01-19SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=SB18
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/SB00018I.htm
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/SB00018S.htm
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/SB00018E.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/85r/pdf/85RSJ04-04-F.PDF#page=18
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/85r/pdf/85RSJ04-04-F.PDF#page=20
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/85r/pdf/85RSJ04-05-F.PDF#page=22
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/85r/pdf/85RSJ04-05-F.PDF#page=23
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/85r/pdf/85RSJ04-06-F.PDF#page=4
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/85r/pdf/85RSJ04-04-F.PDF#page=21

Bill Comments

feedback