TX SB179 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 25-15)
Status: Passed on June 9 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-09 - Effective on 9/1/17
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to harassment, bullying, and cyberbullying of a public school student or minor and certain mental health programs for public school students; increasing a criminal penalty.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to harassment, bullying, and cyberbullying of a public school student or minor and certain mental health programs for public school students; increasing a criminal penalty.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-27 - Senate - Senate adopts conference committee report (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-27 - House - House adopts conference committee report RV#1938 (Y: 136 N: 11 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-12 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1247 (Y: 130 N: 11 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-05-11 - House - Amended RV#1192 (Y: 104 N: 38 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-05-03 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-03 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-09 Effective on 9/1/17
2017-06-09 Signed by the Governor
2017-05-28 Sent to the Governor
2017-05-28HouseSigned in the House
2017-05-28SenateSigned in the Senate
2017-05-28HouseSenate adopts conf. comm. report-reported
2017-05-27SenateReported enrolled
2017-05-27SenateHouse adopts conf. comm. report-reported
2017-05-27SenateRecord vote
2017-05-27SenateSenate adopts conference committee report
2017-05-27SenateCo-author authorized
2017-05-27HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2017-05-27HouseRecord vote
2017-05-27HouseHouse adopts conference committee report
2017-05-26HouseConf. Comm. Report distributed
2017-05-25SenateConference committee report filed
2017-05-21SenateHouse appoints conferees-reported
2017-05-21SenateHouse grants request for conf comm-reported
2017-05-19HouseHouse appoints conferees
2017-05-19HouseHouse grants request for conference committee
2017-05-18HouseSenate appoints conferees-reported
2017-05-18HouseSenate requests conference committee-reported
2017-05-18HouseSenate refuses to concur-reported
2017-05-17SenateSenate appoints conferees
2017-05-17SenateSenate requests conference committee
2017-05-17SenateSenate refuses to concur
2017-05-17SenateRead
2017-05-17SenateHouse amendment(s) laid before the Senate
2017-05-15SenateHouse passage as amended reported
2017-05-12HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2017-05-12HouseRecord vote
2017-05-12HousePassed
2017-05-12HouseRead 3rd time
2017-05-11HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2017-05-11HouseRecord vote
2017-05-11HousePassed to 3rd reading as amended
2017-05-11HouseAmended
2017-05-11HouseAmended
2017-05-11HouseRead 2nd time
2017-05-11HouseLaid out in lieu of companion
2017-05-09HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2017-05-09HouseCommittee report distributed
2017-05-09HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2017-05-08HouseReported favorably as substituted
2017-05-08HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2017-05-08HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2017-05-05HouseReferred to Public Education
2017-05-05HouseRead first time
2017-05-04HouseReceived from the Senate
2017-05-03SenateReported engrossed
2017-05-03SenateRecord vote
2017-05-03SenatePassed
2017-05-03SenateRead 3rd time
2017-05-03SenateRecord vote
2017-05-03SenateThree day rule suspended
2017-05-03SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-05-03SenatePassed to engrossment as amended
2017-05-03SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-05-03SenateAmended
2017-05-03SenateAmendment(s) offered
2017-05-03SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-05-03SenateAmended
2017-05-03SenateAmendment(s) offered
2017-05-03SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-05-03SenateAmended
2017-05-03SenateAmendment(s) offered
2017-05-03SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-05-03SenateAmended
2017-05-03SenateAmendment(s) offered
2017-05-03SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-05-03SenateAmended
2017-05-03SenateAmendment(s) offered
2017-05-03SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-05-03SenateAmended
2017-05-03SenateAmendment(s) offered
2017-05-03SenateRead 2nd time
2017-05-03SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2017-05-03SenateCo-author authorized
2017-04-26SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2017-04-26SenateCo-author authorized
2017-04-25SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2017-04-25SenateReported favorably as substituted
2017-04-25SenateCo-author authorized
2017-04-20SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-04-06SenateLeft pending in committee
2017-04-06SenateTestimony taken in committee
2017-04-06SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-04-06SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-03-28SenateCo-author authorized
2017-03-27SenateCo-author authorized
2017-03-06SenateCo-author authorized
2017-01-25SenateReferred to State Affairs
2017-01-25SenateRead first time
2016-11-14SenateFiled
2016-11-14SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=SB179
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/SB00179I.htm
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/SB00179S.htm
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/SB00179E.htm
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/SB00179H.htm
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/SB00179F.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/85r/pdf/85RSJ05-03-F.PDF#page=22
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=SB179&RcdVtNo=1192&Ch=H&Dt=05/11/2017
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=SB179&RcdVtNo=1247&Ch=H&Dt=05/12/2017
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=SB179&RcdVtNo=1938&Ch=H&Dt=05/27/2017
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/85r/pdf/85RSJ05-27-F.PDF#page=87

Bill Comments

feedback