TX SB1786 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 15 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-18 - Failed to receive affirmative vote in comm.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 15 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-18 - Failed to receive affirmative vote in comm.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the applicability of certain laws to open-enrollment charter schools.
Title
Relating to the applicability of certain laws to open-enrollment charter schools.
Sponsors
Sen. Bob Hall [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-05-15 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 20 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-15 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 20 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-11 - Senate - Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment (Y: 29 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-11 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 29 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-15 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 20 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-11 - Senate - Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment (Y: 29 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-11 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 29 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-18 | House | Failed to receive affirmative vote in comm. |
2017-05-18 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-05-17 | House | Referred to Public Education |
2017-05-17 | House | Read first time |
2017-05-15 | House | Received from the Senate |
2017-05-15 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2017-05-15 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-05-15 | Senate | Passed |
2017-05-15 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2017-05-15 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-05-15 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2017-05-08 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Not again placed on intent calendar |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Referred to Education |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Read first time |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Filed |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |