TX SB1771 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-15 - Not again placed on intent calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-15 - Not again placed on intent calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the ad valorem taxation of a leasehold or other possessory interest in certain property owned by a municipality.
Title
Relating to the ad valorem taxation of a leasehold or other possessory interest in certain property owned by a municipality.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-15 | Senate | Not again placed on intent calendar |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Not again placed on intent calendar |
2019-05-06 | Senate | Corrected comm. report printed & distributed |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2019-05-06 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2019-05-06 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Referred to Property Tax |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Filed |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB4528 (Same As) 2019-03-26 - Referred to Ways & Means
Subjects
Public Lands, Buildings & Resources
Taxation
Taxation--Property-Appraisals & Appraisal Districts
Taxation--Property-Exemptions
Taxation
Taxation--Property-Appraisals & Appraisal Districts
Taxation--Property-Exemptions