TX SB1764 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 19 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-19 - Effective immediately
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 19 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-19 - Effective immediately
Summary
Relating to the dissemination of information regarding the cost of attending public and private institutions of higher education and regarding the availability of financial aid to assist in paying that cost.
Title
Relating to the dissemination of information regarding the cost of attending public and private institutions of higher education and regarding the availability of financial aid to assist in paying that cost.
Sponsors
Rep. Ellen Cohen [D] | Sen. Kirk Watson [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-06-19 | Effective immediately | |
2009-06-19 | Signed by the Governor | |
2009-06-03 | Sent to the Governor | |
2009-06-03 | Signed in the House | |
2009-06-02 | Signed in the Senate | |
2009-05-30 | Reported enrolled | |
2009-05-30 | Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported | |
2009-05-30 | Record vote | |
2009-05-30 | Senate concurs in House amendment(s) | |
2009-05-30 | Read | |
2009-05-30 | House amendment(s) laid before the Senate | |
2009-05-28 | House passage as amended reported | |
2009-05-27 | Record vote | |
2009-05-27 | Passed | |
2009-05-27 | Read 3rd time | |
2009-05-27 | Passed to 3rd reading | |
2009-05-27 | Read 2nd time | |
2009-05-27 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | |
2009-05-25 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | |
2009-05-23 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | |
2009-05-22 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-05-22 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2009-05-19 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2009-05-19 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | |
2009-05-19 | Committee substitute considered in committee | |
2009-05-19 | Considered in formal meeting | |
2009-05-19 | Meeting cancelled | |
2009-05-19 | Scheduled for formal meeting on . . . | |
2009-05-13 | Referred to Higher Education | |
2009-05-13 | Read first time | |
2009-05-05 | Received from the Senate | |
2009-05-05 | Reported engrossed | |
2009-05-05 | Record vote | |
2009-05-05 | Passed | |
2009-05-05 | Read 3rd time | |
2009-05-05 | Record vote | |
2009-05-05 | Three day rule suspended | |
2009-05-05 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-05-05 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | |
2009-05-05 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | |
2009-05-01 | Placed on intent calendar | |
2009-04-29 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-04-29 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | |
2009-04-29 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-04-29 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-04-22 | Left pending in committee | |
2009-04-22 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-04-22 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-03-20 | Referred to Higher Education | |
2009-03-20 | Read first time | |
2009-03-11 | Filed | |
2009-03-11 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
Education
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--Admission & Attendance
Education--Higher--Student Fees
Education--Higher--Tuition
HIGHER EDUCATION COORDINATING BOARD, TEXAS
INTERNET
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--Admission & Attendance
Education--Higher--Student Fees
Education--Higher--Tuition
HIGHER EDUCATION COORDINATING BOARD, TEXAS
INTERNET