TX SB176 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-2)
Status: Introduced on November 14 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-21 - Co-author authorized
Pending: Senate Business & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 14 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-21 - Co-author authorized
Pending: Senate Business & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the regulation of transportation network companies; requiring an occupational permit; authorizing a fee.
Title
Relating to the regulation of transportation network companies; requiring an occupational permit; authorizing a fee.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-21 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-02-01 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2017-01-30 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Referred to Business & Commerce |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Read first time |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2017-01-17 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2016-11-14 | Senate | Filed |
2016-11-14 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
COMMISSION OF LICENSING & REGULATION
Electronic Information Systems
LICENSING & REGULATION, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
Occupational Regulation
Occupational Regulation--Other Trades & Professions
PERMITS
Vehicles & Traffic
Vehicles & Traffic--DWI & DUID
Vehicles & Traffic--General
Vehicles & Traffic--Insurance/Financial Responsibility
Vehicles & Traffic--Vehicle Registration
VEHICLES FOR HIRE
Electronic Information Systems
LICENSING & REGULATION, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
Occupational Regulation
Occupational Regulation--Other Trades & Professions
PERMITS
Vehicles & Traffic
Vehicles & Traffic--DWI & DUID
Vehicles & Traffic--General
Vehicles & Traffic--Insurance/Financial Responsibility
Vehicles & Traffic--Vehicle Registration
VEHICLES FOR HIRE
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=SB176 |
Text | http://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/SB00176I.htm |