TX SB1758 | 2023-2024 | 88th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 19 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-19 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 19 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-19 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the use of certain land by The University of Texas System.
Title
Relating to the use of certain land by The University of Texas System.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-06 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1176 (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2023-04-20 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-20 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-20 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-20 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-19 | Effective immediately | |
2023-05-19 | Signed by the Governor | |
2023-05-09 | Sent to the Governor | |
2023-05-09 | House | Signed in the House |
2023-05-09 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2023-05-08 | Senate | Reported enrolled |
2023-05-08 | Senate | House passage reported |
2023-05-06 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2023-05-06 | House | Record vote RV#1176 |
2023-05-06 | House | Passed |
2023-05-06 | House | Read 3rd time |
2023-05-06 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2023-05-06 | House | Passed to 3rd reading |
2023-05-06 | House | Read 2nd time |
2023-05-06 | House | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar |
2023-05-03 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2023-05-02 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2023-05-02 | House | Committee report distributed |
2023-05-01 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2023-04-27 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2023-04-27 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2023-04-27 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2023-04-21 | House | Referred to Land & Resource Management |
2023-04-21 | House | Read first time |
2023-04-20 | House | Received from the Senate |
2023-04-20 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2023-04-20 | Senate | Record vote |
2023-04-20 | Senate | Passed |
2023-04-20 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2023-04-20 | Senate | Record vote |
2023-04-20 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2023-04-20 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2023-04-20 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2023-04-20 | Senate | Laid before the Senate |
2023-04-20 | Senate | Placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2023-04-17 | Senate | Corrected comm. report printed & distributed |
2023-04-17 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2023-04-17 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2023-04-17 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2023-04-12 | Senate | Vote taken in committee |
2023-04-12 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2023-04-06 | Senate | Reported from s/c favorably w/o amendments |
2023-04-06 | Senate | Considered by subcommittee |
2023-04-06 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . . |
2023-03-20 | Senate | Referred to s/c on Higher Education by Pres |
2023-03-20 | Senate | Read first time |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Filed |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB4814 (Same As) 2023-04-18 - Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
HB4814 (Same As) 2023-04-18 - Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
HB4814 (Same As) 2023-04-18 - Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
Subjects
Education
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--Health Institutions
Education--Higher--Institutions & Programs
Parks & Wildlife
Parks & Wildlife--General
Property Interests
Property Interests--Real Property
UNIVERSITY OF TEXAS SYSTEM
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--Health Institutions
Education--Higher--Institutions & Programs
Parks & Wildlife
Parks & Wildlife--General
Property Interests
Property Interests--Real Property
UNIVERSITY OF TEXAS SYSTEM