TX SB1751 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on May 15 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-05-17 - Sent to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the creation and operations of a health care provider participation program by the El Paso County Hospital District.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the creation and operations of a health care provider participation program by the El Paso County Hospital District.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-14 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1361 (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-17 Sent to the Governor
2019-05-17HouseSigned in the House
2019-05-16SenateSigned in the Senate
2019-05-15SenateReported enrolled
2019-05-15SenateHouse passage reported
2019-05-14HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2019-05-14HouseRecord vote RV#1361
2019-05-14HousePassed
2019-05-14HouseRead 3rd time
2019-05-14HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2019-05-14HousePassed to 3rd reading
2019-05-14HouseRead 2nd time
2019-05-14HousePlaced on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
2019-05-10HouseConsidered in Local & Consent Calendars
2019-04-23HouseComm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
2019-04-22HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-04-22HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-04-16HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2019-04-16HouseRecommended to be sent to Local & Consent
2019-04-16HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2019-04-11HouseReferred to County Affairs
2019-04-11HouseRead first time
2019-04-10HouseReceived from the Senate
2019-04-09SenateReported engrossed
2019-04-09SenateRecord vote
2019-04-09SenatePassed
2019-04-09SenateRead 3rd time
2019-04-09SenateRecord vote
2019-04-09SenateThree day rule suspended
2019-04-09SenateVote recorded in Journal
2019-04-09SenatePassed to engrossment as amended
2019-04-09SenateVote recorded in Journal
2019-04-09SenateAmended
2019-04-09SenateAmendment(s) offered FA1 Rodríguez
2019-04-09SenateRead 2nd time
2019-04-09SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2019-04-04SenateCorrected comm. report printed & distributed
2019-04-04SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2019-04-03SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2019-04-03SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2019-04-03SenateReported favorably as substituted
2019-04-01SenateTestimony taken in committee
2019-04-01SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-04-01SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-03-14SenateReferred to Intergovernmental Relations
2019-03-14SenateRead first time
2019-03-06SenateFiled
2019-03-06SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Same As/Similar To

HB3640 (Same As) 2019-04-16 - Companion considered in lieu of in committee

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback