TX SB1745 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 18 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-24 - Referred to House Administration
Pending: House Administration Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 18 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-24 - Referred to House Administration
Pending: House Administration Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the creation of a joint interim committee to study colonias and colonia initiatives in this state.
Title
Relating to the creation of a joint interim committee to study colonias and colonia initiatives in this state.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-18 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-05-18 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-18 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-24 | House | Referred to House Administration |
2021-05-24 | House | Read first time |
2021-05-19 | House | Received from the Senate |
2021-05-18 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2021-05-18 | Senate | Record vote |
2021-05-18 | Senate | Passed |
2021-05-18 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2021-05-18 | Senate | Record vote |
2021-05-18 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2021-05-18 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2021-05-18 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2021-05-18 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2021-05-18 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2021-05-17 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2021-05-13 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2021-05-13 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2021-05-03 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2021-05-03 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2021-05-03 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2021-05-03 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-03-26 | Senate | Referred to Local Government |
2021-03-26 | Senate | Read first time |
2021-03-12 | Senate | Filed |
2021-03-12 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |