TX SB1744 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 3 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-21 - Failed to receive affirmative vote in comm.
Pending: House Urban Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 3 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-21 - Failed to receive affirmative vote in comm.
Pending: House Urban Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the services provided by a colonia self-help center.
Title
Relating to the services provided by a colonia self-help center.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-03 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 28 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-03 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-03 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-21 | House | Failed to receive affirmative vote in comm. |
2021-05-21 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2021-05-05 | House | Referred to Urban Affairs |
2021-05-05 | House | Read first time |
2021-05-04 | House | Received from the Senate |
2021-05-03 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2021-05-03 | Senate | Record vote |
2021-05-03 | Senate | Passed |
2021-05-03 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2021-05-03 | Senate | Record vote |
2021-05-03 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2021-05-03 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2021-05-03 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2021-05-03 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-03-26 | Senate | Referred to Local Government |
2021-03-26 | Senate | Read first time |
2021-03-12 | Senate | Filed |
2021-03-12 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB1301 (Similar To) 2021-06-15 - Effective on 9/1/21
HB1301 (Similar To) 2021-06-15 - Effective on 9/1/21
HB1301 (Similar To) 2021-06-15 - Effective on 9/1/21