TX SB1744 | 2011-2012 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 21 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-24 - Placed on General State Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 21 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-24 - Placed on General State Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the certification of a certified capital company.
Title
Relating to the certification of a certified capital company.
Sponsors
Sen. Kevin Eltife [R] | Rep. Jim Murphy [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-24 | Placed on General State Calendar | |
2011-05-21 | Considered in Calendars | |
2011-05-17 | Considered in Calendars | |
2011-05-02 | Committee report sent to Calendars | |
2011-04-29 | Committee report distributed | |
2011-04-29 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2011-04-29 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | |
2011-04-29 | Considered in formal meeting | |
2011-04-26 | Referred to Economic & Small Business Development | |
2011-04-26 | Read first time | |
2011-04-21 | Received from the Senate | |
2011-04-21 | Reported engrossed | |
2011-04-21 | Record vote | |
2011-04-21 | Passed | |
2011-04-21 | Read 3rd time | |
2011-04-21 | Record vote | |
2011-04-21 | Three day rule suspended | |
2011-04-21 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-04-21 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | |
2011-04-21 | Laid before the Senate | |
2011-04-21 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | |
2011-04-11 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2011-04-11 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | |
2011-04-11 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | |
2011-04-07 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-04-07 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-04-07 | Posting rule suspended | |
2011-04-06 | Left pending in committee | |
2011-04-06 | Testimony taken in committee | |
2011-04-06 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-04-06 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-03-23 | Referred to Economic Development | |
2011-03-23 | Read first time | |
2011-03-11 | Filed | |
2011-03-11 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |