TX SB1736 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 20 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-17 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the liability of a person who allows handguns to be carried on property owned, controlled, or managed by the person.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the liability of a person who allows handguns to be carried on property owned, controlled, or managed by the person.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-20 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 22 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-20 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 29 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-20 - Senate - Record vote (Y: 23 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-20 - Senate - FA1 Hughes (Y: 23 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-17HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2017-05-17HouseCommittee report distributed
2017-05-17HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2017-05-16HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2017-05-16HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2017-05-05HouseReferred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence
2017-05-05HouseRead first time
2017-04-24HouseReceived from the Senate
2017-04-20SenateReported engrossed
2017-04-20SenateRecord vote
2017-04-20SenatePassed
2017-04-20SenateRead 3rd time
2017-04-20SenateRecord vote
2017-04-20SenateThree day rule suspended
2017-04-20SenateRecord vote
2017-04-20SenatePassed to engrossment as amended
2017-04-20SenateRecord vote
2017-04-20SenateAmended
2017-04-20SenateAmendment(s) offered
2017-04-20SenateRead 2nd time
2017-04-20SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-04-20SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2017-04-20SenateCo-author authorized
2017-04-19SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2017-04-18SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2017-04-18SenateReported favorably as substituted
2017-04-10SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-04-06SenateLeft pending in committee
2017-04-06SenateTestimony taken in committee
2017-04-06SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-04-06SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-03-23SenateReferred to State Affairs
2017-03-23SenateRead first time
2017-03-09SenateFiled
2017-03-09SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback