TX SB1732 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature


Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-15 - Effective on 9/1/17
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]


Relating to the designation of a portion of Interstate Highway 35W in Johnson County as the Deputy Clifton Taylor Memorial Highway.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.


Relating to the designation of a portion of Interstate Highway 35W in Johnson County as the Deputy Clifton Taylor Memorial Highway.


Roll Calls

2017-05-19 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1358 (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]


2017-06-15 Effective on 9/1/17
2017-06-15 Signed by the Governor
2017-05-23 Sent to the Governor
2017-05-23HouseSigned in the House
2017-05-22SenateSigned in the Senate
2017-05-22SenateReported enrolled
2017-05-21SenateHouse passage reported
2017-05-19HouseRecord vote
2017-05-19HouseRead 3rd time
2017-05-19HousePassed to 3rd reading
2017-05-19HouseRead 2nd time
2017-05-19HousePlaced on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
2017-05-16HouseConsidered in Local & Consent Calendars
2017-05-15HouseComm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
2017-05-14HouseCommittee report distributed
2017-05-12HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2017-05-11HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2017-05-11HouseRecommended to be sent to Local & Consent
2017-05-11HouseConsidered in public hearing
2017-05-08HouseReferred to Transportation
2017-05-08HouseRead first time
2017-05-04HouseReceived from the Senate
2017-05-04SenateReported engrossed
2017-05-04SenateRecord vote
2017-05-04SenateRead 3rd time
2017-05-04SenateRecord vote
2017-05-04SenateThree day rule suspended
2017-05-04SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-05-04SenateRead 2nd time & passed to engrossment
2017-05-04SenateLaid before the Senate
2017-05-04SenatePlaced on local & uncontested calendar
2017-05-02SenateNot again placed on intent calendar
2017-04-25SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2017-04-20SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2017-04-20SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2017-04-20SenateReported favorably as substituted
2017-04-19SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-04-12SenateLeft pending in committee
2017-04-12SenateTestimony taken in committee
2017-04-12SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-04-12SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-03-23SenateReferred to Transportation
2017-03-23SenateRead first time
2017-03-09SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate


Texas State Sources

Bill Comments