TX SB171 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 5 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-05-18 - Left pending in committee
Pending: House Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to a report regarding Medicaid reimbursement rates, supplemental payment amounts, and access to care.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to a report regarding Medicaid reimbursement rates, supplemental payment amounts, and access to care.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-05 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-05 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-18HouseLeft pending in committee
2021-05-18HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2021-05-18HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-05-18HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-05-11HouseReferred to Human Services
2021-05-11HouseRead first time
2021-05-05HouseReceived from the Senate
2021-05-05SenateReported engrossed
2021-05-05SenateRecord vote
2021-05-05SenatePassed
2021-05-05SenateRead 3rd time
2021-05-05SenateRecord vote
2021-05-05SenateThree day rule suspended
2021-05-05SenateVote recorded in Journal
2021-05-05SenateRead 2nd time & passed to engrossment
2021-05-05SenateLaid before the Senate
2021-05-05SenatePlaced on local & uncontested calendar
2021-05-04SenateCo-author authorized
2021-04-29SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2021-04-29SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2021-04-29SenateReported favorably as substituted
2021-04-26SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-04-26SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-04-14SenateLeft pending in committee
2021-04-14SenateTestimony taken in committee
2021-04-14SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-04-14SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-04-06SenateCo-author authorized
2021-03-24SenateCo-author authorized
2021-03-03SenateReferred to Health & Human Services
2021-03-03SenateRead first time
2020-11-10SenateFiled
2020-11-10SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback