TX SB1703 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 23 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-26 - Placed on Major State Calendar
Status: Engrossed on April 23 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-26 - Placed on Major State Calendar
Summary
Relating to methods of delivery used by the secretary of state.
Title
Relating to methods of delivery used by the secretary of state.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-26 | Placed on Major State Calendar | |
2009-05-24 | Considered in Calendars | |
2009-05-22 | Committee report sent to Calendars | |
2009-05-21 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-05-21 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2009-05-19 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | |
2009-05-19 | Considered in formal meeting | |
2009-05-01 | Referred to State Affairs | |
2009-05-01 | Read first time | |
2009-04-23 | Received from the Senate | |
2009-04-23 | Reported engrossed | |
2009-04-23 | Record vote | |
2009-04-23 | Passed | |
2009-04-23 | Read 3rd time | |
2009-04-23 | Record vote | |
2009-04-23 | Three day rule suspended | |
2009-04-23 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-04-23 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | |
2009-04-23 | Laid before the Senate | |
2009-04-23 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | |
2009-04-09 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-04-09 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | |
2009-04-09 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | |
2009-04-07 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-04-07 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-03-20 | Referred to Business & Commerce | |
2009-03-20 | Read first time | |
2009-03-10 | Filed | |
2009-03-10 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
SECRETARY OF STATE
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions--Admin. Procedure
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions--Admin. Procedure