TX SB17 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 3 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-04 - Referred to State Affairs
Pending: House State Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 3 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-04 - Referred to State Affairs
Pending: House State Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to discrimination by a state agency against an applicant for or holder of an occupational license.
Title
Relating to discrimination by a state agency against an applicant for or holder of an occupational license.
Sponsors
Sen. Charles Perry [R] | Sen. Paul Bettencourt [R] | Sen. Brian Birdwell [R] | Sen. Donna Campbell [R] |
Sen. Charles Creighton [R] | Sen. Bob Hall [R] | Sen. Eddie Lucio [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-03 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 19 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 19 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - Senate - Record vote (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - Senate - Amendment fails of adoption (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - Senate - Amendment fails of adoption (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 19 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - Senate - Record vote (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - Senate - Amendment fails of adoption (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - Senate - Amendment fails of adoption (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-04 | House | Referred to State Affairs |
2019-04-04 | House | Read first time |
2019-04-03 | House | Received from the Senate |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Remarks ordered printed |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Remarks ordered printed |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Reason for vote recorded in Journal |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Passed |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Amendment fails of adoption |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered FA3 RodrÃguez |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Amendment fails of adoption |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered FA2 Menéndez |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Amended |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered FA1 Perry |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2019-03-29 | Senate | Corrected comm. report printed & distributed |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Referred to State Affairs |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Filed |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB2827 (Same As) 2019-03-12 - Referred to State Affairs
Subjects
DISCRIMINATION
Occupational Regulation
Occupational Regulation--Health Occupations
Occupational Regulation--Other Trades & Professions
Religion
STATE AGENCIES' RULES
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions
Occupational Regulation
Occupational Regulation--Health Occupations
Occupational Regulation--Other Trades & Professions
Religion
STATE AGENCIES' RULES
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions