TX SB17 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 21 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-05 - Referred to Ways & Means
Pending: House Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 21 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-05 - Referred to Ways & Means
Pending: House Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the decrease of the rates of the franchise tax under certain circumstances and the expiration of that tax.
Title
Relating to the decrease of the rates of the franchise tax under certain circumstances and the expiration of that tax.
Sponsors
Sen. Jane Nelson [R] | Sen. Paul Bettencourt [R] | Sen. Konni Burton [R] | Sen. Charles Creighton [R] |
Sen. Bob Hall [R] | Sen. Donald Huffines [R] | Sen. Nicholas Taylor [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-21 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 23 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-21 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 18 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-21 - Senate - Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment (Y: 18 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-21 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 18 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-21 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 18 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-21 - Senate - Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment (Y: 18 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-21 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 18 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-05 | House | Referred to Ways & Means |
2017-05-05 | House | Read first time |
2017-03-22 | House | Received from the Senate |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Passed |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2017-03-06 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2017-03-06 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Referred to Finance |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Read first time |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Filed |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |