TX SB1697 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-16 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to allowing parents and guardians to elect for a student to repeat or retake a course or grade.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to allowing parents and guardians to elect for a student to repeat or retake a course or grade.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-25 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1467 (Y: 147 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-23 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-23 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-23 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-23 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-16 Effective immediately
2021-06-16 Signed by the Governor
2021-05-27 Sent to the Governor
2021-05-27HouseSigned in the House
2021-05-27SenateSigned in the Senate
2021-05-25SenateReported enrolled
2021-05-25SenateHouse passage reported
2021-05-25HouseRecord vote RV#1467
2021-05-25HousePassed
2021-05-25HouseRead 3rd time
2021-05-24HousePassed to 3rd reading
2021-05-24HouseRead 2nd time
2021-05-24HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2021-05-20HouseConsidered in Calendars
2021-05-19HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2021-05-18HouseCommittee report distributed
2021-05-18HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2021-05-17HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2021-05-17HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2021-04-26HouseReferred to Public Education
2021-04-26HouseRead first time
2021-04-23HouseReceived from the Senate
2021-04-23SenateReported engrossed
2021-04-23SenateRecord vote
2021-04-23SenatePassed
2021-04-23SenateRead 3rd time
2021-04-23SenateRecord vote
2021-04-23SenateThree day rule suspended
2021-04-23SenateVote recorded in Journal
2021-04-23SenateRead 2nd time & passed to engrossment
2021-04-23SenateLaid before the Senate
2021-04-23SenatePlaced on local & uncontested calendar
2021-04-13SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2021-04-13SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2021-04-13SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2021-04-13SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-04-08SenateLeft pending in committee
2021-04-08SenateTestimony taken in committee
2021-04-08SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-04-08SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-03-26SenateReferred to Education
2021-03-26SenateRead first time
2021-03-11SenateFiled
2021-03-11SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Same As/Similar To

HB3557 (Same As) 2021-05-17 - Referred to Education

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=SB1697
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB01697I.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB01697S.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB01697E.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB01697H.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB01697F.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/SB01697I.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/SB01697I.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/SB01697H.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/SB01697F.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/87r/pdf/87RSJ-04-23-F.PDF#page=4
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=SB1697&RcdVtNo=1467&Ch=H&Dt=05/25/2021
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/87r/pdf/87RSJ04-23-F.PDF#page=4

Bill Comments

feedback