TX SB1691 | 2013-2014 | 83rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 8 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-22 - Committee report printed and distributed
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 8 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-22 - Committee report printed and distributed
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the administration of oaths and issuance of subpoenas in an arbitration proceeding involving firefighters or police officers in certain political subdivisions.
Title
Relating to the administration of oaths and issuance of subpoenas in an arbitration proceeding involving firefighters or police officers in certain political subdivisions.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-22 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2013-04-22 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2013-04-22 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2013-03-25 | Senate | Referred to Intergovernmental Relations |
2013-03-25 | Senate | Read first time |
2013-03-08 | Senate | Filed |
2013-03-08 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
City Government
City Government--Employees/Officers
County Government
County Government--Employees/Officers
Fire Fighters & Police
Fire Fighters & Police--General
MEDIATION, DISPUTE RESOLUTION, & ARBITRATION
OATHS
SUBPOENAS
City Government--Employees/Officers
County Government
County Government--Employees/Officers
Fire Fighters & Police
Fire Fighters & Police--General
MEDIATION, DISPUTE RESOLUTION, & ARBITRATION
OATHS
SUBPOENAS