TX SB1685 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 19 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-19 - Effective immediately
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 19 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-19 - Effective immediately
Summary
Relating to the creation of a district court records technology fund.
Title
Relating to the creation of a district court records technology fund.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-06-19 | Effective immediately | |
2009-06-19 | Signed by the Governor | |
2009-06-01 | Sent to the Governor | |
2009-05-31 | Signed in the House | |
2009-05-30 | Signed in the Senate | |
2009-05-28 | Reported enrolled | |
2009-05-28 | House passage reported | |
2009-05-27 | Record vote | |
2009-05-27 | Passed | |
2009-05-27 | Read 3rd time | |
2009-05-27 | Passed to 3rd reading | |
2009-05-27 | Read 2nd time | |
2009-05-27 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | |
2009-05-25 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | |
2009-05-23 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | |
2009-05-23 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-05-22 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2009-05-21 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | |
2009-05-21 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | |
2009-05-21 | Considered in formal meeting | |
2009-05-04 | Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence | |
2009-05-04 | Read first time | |
2009-04-30 | Received from the Senate | |
2009-04-30 | Reported engrossed | |
2009-04-30 | Record vote | |
2009-04-30 | Passed | |
2009-04-30 | Read 3rd time | |
2009-04-30 | Record vote | |
2009-04-30 | Three day rule suspended | |
2009-04-30 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-04-30 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | |
2009-04-30 | Laid before the Senate | |
2009-04-30 | Not again placed on intent calendar | |
2009-04-30 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | |
2009-04-28 | Placed on intent calendar | |
2009-04-20 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-04-20 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | |
2009-04-20 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2009-04-15 | Testimony taken in committee | |
2009-04-15 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-04-15 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-03-20 | Referred to Jurisprudence | |
2009-03-20 | Read first time | |
2009-03-10 | Filed | |
2009-03-10 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB3312 (Same As) 2009-05-05 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Subjects
County Government
County Government--General
Courts
Courts--District
Fees & Other Nontax Revenue
Fees & Other Nontax Revenue--Local
RECORDS MANAGEMENT
County Government--General
Courts
Courts--District
Fees & Other Nontax Revenue
Fees & Other Nontax Revenue--Local
RECORDS MANAGEMENT