TX SB1671 | 2023-2024 | 88th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 6 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-04-24 - Left pending in committee
Pending: Senate Water, Agriculture, & Rural Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 6 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-04-24 - Left pending in committee
Pending: Senate Water, Agriculture, & Rural Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the contracting authority of the Parks and Wildlife Department.
Title
Relating to the contracting authority of the Parks and Wildlife Department.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-24 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2023-04-24 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2023-04-24 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2023-04-24 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2023-03-16 | Senate | Referred to Water, Agriculture, & Rural Affairs |
2023-03-16 | Senate | Read first time |
2023-03-06 | Senate | Filed |
2023-03-06 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB2777 (Same As) 2023-06-02 - Effective immediately
HB2777 (Same As) 2023-06-02 - Effective immediately
HB2777 (Same As) 2023-06-02 - Effective immediately
Subjects
COMPETITIVE BIDDING
Parks & Wildlife
PARKS & WILDLIFE DEPARTMENT
Parks & Wildlife--General
Purchasing
Purchasing--State
Parks & Wildlife
PARKS & WILDLIFE DEPARTMENT
Parks & Wildlife--General
Purchasing
Purchasing--State