TX SB1657 | 2015-2016 | 84th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 10 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-10 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 10 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-10 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to approval of the issuance of tax and revenue anticipation notes.
Title
Relating to approval of the issuance of tax and revenue anticipation notes.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-05-20 - House - SB 1657Third Reading House (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-10 | Effective immediately | |
2015-06-10 | Signed by the Governor | |
2015-05-21 | Sent to the Governor | |
2015-05-21 | House | Signed in the House |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2015-05-20 | Senate | Reported enrolled |
2015-05-20 | Senate | House passage reported |
2015-05-20 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2015-05-20 | House | Record vote |
2015-05-20 | House | Passed |
2015-05-20 | House | Read 3rd time |
2015-05-19 | House | Passed to 3rd reading |
2015-05-19 | House | Read 2nd time |
2015-05-19 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2015-05-15 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2015-05-08 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2015-05-08 | House | Committee report distributed |
2015-05-07 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2015-05-05 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2015-05-05 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2015-05-05 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2015-05-04 | House | Posting rule suspended |
2015-05-01 | House | Referred to Appropriations |
2015-05-01 | House | Read first time |
2015-04-15 | House | Received from the Senate |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Record vote |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Passed |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Record vote |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2015-04-13 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2015-04-08 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2015-04-08 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2015-04-08 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2015-03-23 | Senate | Referred to Finance |
2015-03-23 | Senate | Read first time |
2015-03-13 | Senate | Filed |
2015-03-13 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |