TX SB1649 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 9 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-09 - Effective on 9/1/17
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 9 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-09 - Effective on 9/1/17
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to increasing the punishment for certain conduct constituting the offense of criminal trespass.
Title
Relating to increasing the punishment for certain conduct constituting the offense of criminal trespass.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-26 - Senate - Senate concurs in House amendment(s) (Y: 25 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-23 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1627 (Y: 105 N: 40 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-05-10 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 25 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-10 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 25 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-23 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1627 (Y: 105 N: 40 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-05-10 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 25 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-10 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 25 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-09 | Effective on 9/1/17 | |
2017-06-09 | Signed by the Governor | |
2017-05-28 | Sent to the Governor | |
2017-05-28 | House | Signed in the House |
2017-05-27 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2017-05-26 | Senate | Reported enrolled |
2017-05-26 | House | Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported |
2017-05-26 | Senate | Remarks ordered printed |
2017-05-26 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-05-26 | Senate | Senate concurs in House amendment(s) |
2017-05-26 | Senate | Read |
2017-05-26 | Senate | House amendment(s) laid before the Senate |
2017-05-23 | Senate | House passage as amended reported |
2017-05-23 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-23 | House | Record vote |
2017-05-23 | House | Passed |
2017-05-23 | House | Read 3rd time |
2017-05-22 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-22 | House | Passed to 3rd reading as amended |
2017-05-22 | House | Amended |
2017-05-22 | House | Read 2nd time |
2017-05-22 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2017-05-20 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2017-05-19 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2017-05-18 | House | Committee report distributed |
2017-05-18 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2017-05-17 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2017-05-17 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2017-05-12 | House | Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence |
2017-05-12 | House | Read first time |
2017-05-10 | House | Received from the Senate |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Passed |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Posting rule suspended |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Referred to Criminal Justice |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Read first time |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Filed |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
Crimes
Crimes--Miscellaneous
Education
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--Institutions & Programs
TRESPASS
Crimes--Miscellaneous
Education
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--Institutions & Programs
TRESPASS