TX SB1646 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 14-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 28 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-05-03 - Referred to Public Health
Pending: House Public Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the definition of abuse of a child.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the definition of abuse of a child.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-28 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 18 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 18 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - Senate - Record vote (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - Senate - Amendment fails of adoption (Y: 12 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-04-27 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 18 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - Senate - Record vote (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - Senate - Amendment fails of adoption (Y: 12 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-04-27 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 18 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-03HouseReferred to Public Health
2021-05-03HouseRead first time
2021-04-29HouseReceived from the Senate
2021-04-28SenateReported engrossed
2021-04-28SenateRecord vote
2021-04-28SenatePassed
2021-04-28SenateRead 3rd time
2021-04-28SenateRecord vote
2021-04-28SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2021-04-27SenateRecord vote
2021-04-27SenatePassed to engrossment
2021-04-27SenateRecord vote
2021-04-27SenateAmendment fails of adoption
2021-04-27SenateAmendment(s) offered FA1 Menéndez
2021-04-27SenateRead 2nd time
2021-04-27SenateRecord vote
2021-04-27SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2021-04-27SenateCo-author authorized
2021-04-22SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2021-04-20SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2021-04-20SenateReported favorably as substituted
2021-04-15SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-04-12SenateLeft pending in committee
2021-04-12SenateTestimony taken in committee
2021-04-12SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-04-12SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-03-24SenateReferred to State Affairs
2021-03-24SenateRead first time
2021-03-11SenateFiled
2021-03-11SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Same As/Similar To

HB4014 (Same As) 2021-03-29 - Referred to Public Health

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=SB1646
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB01646I.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB01646S.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB01646E.htm
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/amendments/html/SB01646S2F1.HTM
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/SB01646I.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/SB01646I.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/SB01646S.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/SB01646S.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/87r/pdf/87RSJ-04-27-F.PDF#page=13
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/87r/pdf/87RSJ-04-27-F.PDF#page=14
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/87r/pdf/87RSJ04-28-F.PDF#page=11
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/87r/pdf/87RSJ04-27-F.PDF#page=13
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/87r/pdf/87RSJ04-27-F.PDF#page=14

Bill Comments

feedback