TX SB1636 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on May 22 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-05-25 - Sent to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to an annual report prepared by the Health Professions Council.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to an annual report prepared by the Health Professions Council.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-22 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1632 (Y: 137 N: 6 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-09 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-25 Sent to the Governor
2019-05-25HouseSigned in the House
2019-05-24SenateSigned in the Senate
2019-05-22SenateReported enrolled
2019-05-22SenateHouse passage reported
2019-05-22HouseRecord vote RV#1632
2019-05-22HousePassed
2019-05-22HouseRead 3rd time
2019-05-21HousePassed to 3rd reading
2019-05-21HouseRead 2nd time
2019-05-21HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2019-05-19HouseConsidered in Calendars
2019-05-13HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2019-05-10HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-05-10HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-05-09HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2019-05-09HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2019-05-01HouseLeft pending in committee
2019-05-01HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2019-05-01HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-05-01HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-04-11HouseReferred to Public Health
2019-04-11HouseRead first time
2019-04-10HouseReceived from the Senate
2019-04-09SenateReported engrossed
2019-04-09SenateRecord vote
2019-04-09SenatePassed
2019-04-09SenateRead 3rd time
2019-04-09SenateRecord vote
2019-04-09SenateThree day rule suspended
2019-04-09SenateVote recorded in Journal
2019-04-09SenateRead 2nd time & passed to engrossment
2019-04-09SenateVote recorded in Journal
2019-04-09SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2019-04-08SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2019-04-03SenateCorrected comm. report printed & distributed
2019-04-03SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2019-04-03SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2019-04-02SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-03-27SenateLeft pending in committee
2019-03-27SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-03-27SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-03-14SenateReferred to Health & Human Services
2019-03-14SenateRead first time
2019-03-06SenateFiled
2019-03-06SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Same As/Similar To

HB1137 (Same As) 2019-02-26 - Referred to Public Health

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback