TX SB1622 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on March 11 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-05-04 - Placed on intent calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to measures to support the alignment of education and workforce development in the state with state workforce needs, including the establishment of the Tri-Agency Workforce Initiative.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to measures to support the alignment of education and workforce development in the state with state workforce needs, including the establishment of the Tri-Agency Workforce Initiative.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-04SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2021-05-04SenateCo-author authorized
2021-05-03SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2021-05-03SenateReported favorably as substituted
2021-04-28SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-04-28SenateCo-author authorized
2021-04-21SenateLeft pending in committee
2021-04-21SenateTestimony taken in committee
2021-04-21SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-04-21SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-03-24SenateReferred to Higher Education
2021-03-24SenateRead first time
2021-03-11SenateFiled
2021-03-11SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Same As/Similar To

HB3767 (Same As) 2021-05-08 - Committee report sent to Calendars

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback