TX SB162 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-30 - Effective on 9/1/21
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to a false statement made to illegally acquire a firearm; creating a criminal offense.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to a false statement made to illegally acquire a firearm; creating a criminal offense.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-14 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1197 (Y: 117 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 20) [PASS]
2021-05-13 - House - Read 2nd time RV#1083 (Y: 135 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 24 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 26 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - Senate - Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment (Y: 24 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 24 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-30 Effective on 9/1/21
2021-05-30 Signed by the Governor
2021-05-19 Sent to the Governor
2021-05-19HouseSigned in the House
2021-05-19SenateSigned in the Senate
2021-05-18SenateReported enrolled
2021-05-18SenateHouse passage reported
2021-05-14HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2021-05-14HouseRecord vote RV#1197
2021-05-14HousePassed
2021-05-14HouseRead 3rd time
2021-05-13HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2021-05-13HouseRecord vote RV#1083
2021-05-13HousePassed to 3rd reading
2021-05-13HouseRead 2nd time
2021-05-13HouseLaid out in lieu of companion HB 347
2021-05-11HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2021-05-10HouseCommittee report distributed
2021-05-10HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2021-05-07HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2021-05-07HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2021-05-04HouseReferred to Criminal Jurisprudence
2021-05-04HouseRead first time
2021-04-29HouseReceived from the Senate
2021-04-28SenateReported engrossed
2021-04-28SenateRecord vote
2021-04-28SenatePassed
2021-04-28SenateRead 3rd time
2021-04-28SenateRecord vote
2021-04-28SenateThree day rule suspended
2021-04-28SenateRecord vote
2021-04-28SenateRead 2nd time & passed to engrossment
2021-04-28SenateRecord vote
2021-04-28SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2021-04-28SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2021-04-28SenateCo-author authorized
2021-04-27SenateNot again placed on intent calendar
2021-04-26SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2021-04-26SenateCo-author authorized
2021-04-22SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2021-04-22SenateReported favorably as substituted
2021-04-19SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-04-15SenateLeft pending in committee
2021-04-15SenateTestimony taken in committee
2021-04-15SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-04-15SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-03-03SenateReferred to State Affairs
2021-03-03SenateRead first time
2020-11-10SenateFiled
2020-11-10SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Same As/Similar To

HB347 (Similar To) 2021-05-13 - Laid on the table subject to call

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=SB162
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB00162I.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB00162S.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB00162E.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB00162H.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB00162F.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/SB00162I.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/SB00162I.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/SB00162S.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/SB00162S.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/SB00162H.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/SB00162F.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/87r/pdf/87RSJ04-28-F.PDF#page=41
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/87r/pdf/87RSJ04-28-F.PDF#page=42
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=SB162&RcdVtNo=1083&Ch=H&Dt=05/13/2021
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=SB162&RcdVtNo=1197&Ch=H&Dt=05/14/2021

Bill Comments 750

feedback