TX SB162 | 2011-2012 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-17 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-17 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to developing a developmental education plan for students entering public institutions of higher education.
Title
Relating to developing a developmental education plan for students entering public institutions of higher education.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-17 | Effective immediately | |
2011-06-17 | Signed by the Governor | |
2011-05-25 | Sent to the Governor | |
2011-05-24 | Signed in the House | |
2011-05-24 | Signed in the Senate | |
2011-05-23 | Reported enrolled | |
2011-05-23 | House passage reported | |
2011-05-23 | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-05-23 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-05-23 | Record vote | |
2011-05-23 | Passed | |
2011-05-23 | Read 3rd time | |
2011-05-23 | Record vote | |
2011-05-23 | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-05-23 | Constitutional three day rule suspended | |
2011-05-23 | Passed to 3rd reading | |
2011-05-23 | Read 2nd time | |
2011-05-23 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | |
2011-05-21 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | |
2011-05-19 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | |
2011-05-19 | Committee report distributed | |
2011-05-19 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2011-05-18 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | |
2011-05-18 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | |
2011-05-18 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-05-11 | No action taken in committee | |
2011-05-11 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-04-26 | Referred to Higher Education | |
2011-04-26 | Read first time | |
2011-04-15 | Received from the Senate | |
2011-04-14 | Reported engrossed | |
2011-04-14 | Record vote | |
2011-04-14 | Passed | |
2011-04-14 | Read 3rd time | |
2011-04-14 | Record vote | |
2011-04-14 | Three day rule suspended | |
2011-04-14 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-04-14 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | |
2011-04-14 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | |
2011-04-13 | Placed on intent calendar | |
2011-04-11 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2011-04-11 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | |
2011-04-11 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2011-04-06 | Testimony taken in committee | |
2011-04-06 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-04-06 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-01-31 | Referred to Higher Education | |
2011-01-31 | Read first time | |
2010-11-08 | Filed | |
2010-11-08 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
Education
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--Admission & Attendance
Education--Higher--Institutions & Programs
Education--Higher--State Coordination
HIGHER EDUCATION COORDINATING BOARD, TEXAS
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--Admission & Attendance
Education--Higher--Institutions & Programs
Education--Higher--State Coordination
HIGHER EDUCATION COORDINATING BOARD, TEXAS