TX SB160 | 2011-2012 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 17 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-03-29 - Referred to Natural Resources
Pending: House Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 17 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-03-29 - Referred to Natural Resources
Pending: House Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the regulation of certain aggregate production operations by the Texas Commission on Environmental Quality; providing penalties.
Title
Relating to the regulation of certain aggregate production operations by the Texas Commission on Environmental Quality; providing penalties.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-29 | Referred to Natural Resources | |
2011-03-29 | Read first time | |
2011-03-21 | Received from the Senate | |
2011-03-17 | Reported engrossed | |
2011-03-17 | Record vote | |
2011-03-17 | Passed | |
2011-03-17 | Read 3rd time | |
2011-03-17 | Record vote | |
2011-03-17 | Three day rule suspended | |
2011-03-17 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-03-17 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | |
2011-03-17 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | |
2011-03-17 | Co-author authorized | |
2011-03-16 | Placed on intent calendar | |
2011-03-14 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2011-03-14 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | |
2011-03-14 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2011-03-08 | Testimony taken in committee | |
2011-03-08 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-03-08 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-01-31 | Referred to Natural Resources | |
2011-01-31 | Read first time | |
2010-11-08 | Filed | |
2010-11-08 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
Environment
Environment--General
ENVIRONMENTAL QUALITY, TEXAS COMMISSION ON
Mines & Mineral Resources
ROCK QUARRIES & PITS
Environment--General
ENVIRONMENTAL QUALITY, TEXAS COMMISSION ON
Mines & Mineral Resources
ROCK QUARRIES & PITS