TX SB16 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 59-2)
Status: Passed on May 26 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-26 - Effective on 9/1/17
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to decreasing the fee for the issuance of an original or renewed license to carry a handgun.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to decreasing the fee for the issuance of an original or renewed license to carry a handgun.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-11 - Senate - Senate concurs in House amendment(s) (Y: 29 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-03 - House - Read 3rd time RV#623 (Y: 129 N: 17 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-05-02 - House - Statement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal RV#607 (Y: 111 N: 30 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-03-27 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 26 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-27 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 26 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-27 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-26 Effective on 9/1/17
2017-05-26 Signed by the Governor
2017-05-15 Sent to the Governor
2017-05-15HouseSigned in the House
2017-05-15SenateSigned in the Senate
2017-05-11SenateReported enrolled
2017-05-11HouseSenate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported
2017-05-11SenateRecord vote
2017-05-11SenateSenate concurs in House amendment(s)
2017-05-11SenateRead
2017-05-11SenateHouse amendment(s) laid before the Senate
2017-05-03SenateHouse passage as amended reported
2017-05-03HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2017-05-03HouseRecord vote
2017-05-03HousePassed
2017-05-03HouseRead 3rd time
2017-05-02HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2017-05-02HouseRecord vote
2017-05-02HouseStatement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal
2017-05-02HousePassed to 3rd reading as amended
2017-05-02HouseAmendment withdrawn
2017-05-02HouseVote reconsidered
2017-05-02HousePoint of order withdrawn
2017-05-02HouseAmended
2017-05-02HouseAmendment withdrawn
2017-05-02HousePoint of order sustained (amendment)
2017-05-02HouseAmendment(s) offered
2017-05-02HousePoint of order sustained (amendment)
2017-05-02HouseAmendment(s) offered
2017-05-02HouseAmended
2017-05-02HouseRead 2nd time
2017-05-02HouseLaid out in lieu of companion
2017-04-24HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2017-04-23HouseCommittee report distributed
2017-04-21HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2017-04-20HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2017-04-20HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2017-04-18HouseReferred to Homeland Security & Public Safety
2017-04-18HouseRead first time
2017-03-28HouseReceived from the Senate
2017-03-27SenateReported engrossed
2017-03-27SenateRecord vote
2017-03-27SenatePassed
2017-03-27SenateRead 3rd time
2017-03-27SenateRecord vote
2017-03-27SenateThree day rule suspended
2017-03-27SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-03-27SenatePassed to engrossment as amended
2017-03-27SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-03-27SenateAmended
2017-03-27SenateAmendment(s) offered
2017-03-27SenateRead 2nd time
2017-03-27SenateRecord vote
2017-03-27SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2017-03-27SenateCo-author authorized
2017-03-22SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2017-03-22SenateCo-author authorized
2017-03-21SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2017-03-21SenateReported favorably as substituted
2017-03-20SenateTestimony taken in committee
2017-03-20SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-03-20SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-03-07SenateCo-author authorized
2017-02-27SenateCo-author authorized
2017-02-22SenateCo-author authorized
2017-02-14SenateCo-author authorized
2017-02-13SenateCo-author authorized
2017-02-07SenateCo-author authorized
2017-02-06SenateCo-author authorized
2017-01-30SenateCo-author authorized
2017-01-25SenateCo-author authorized
2017-01-24SenateReferred to State Affairs
2017-01-24SenateRead first time
2017-01-17SenateCo-author authorized
2016-11-30SenateFiled
2016-11-30SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=SB16
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/SB00016I.htm
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/SB00016S.htm
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/SB00016E.htm
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/SB00016H.htm
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/SB00016F.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/85r/pdf/85RSJ03-27-F.PDF#page=6
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=SB16&RcdVtNo=607&Ch=H&Dt=05/02/2017
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=SB16&RcdVtNo=623&Ch=H&Dt=05/03/2017
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/85r/pdf/85RSJ03-27-F.PDF#page=7
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/85r/pdf/85RSJ03-27-F.PDF#page=8
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/85r/pdf/85RSJ05-11-F.PDF#page=47

Bill Comments

feedback