TX SB158 | 2015-2016 | 84th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-3)
Status: Passed on June 19 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-19 - Effective on 9/1/15
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-3)
Status: Passed on June 19 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-19 - Effective on 9/1/15
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to a body worn camera program for certain law enforcement agencies in this state; creating a criminal offense; authorizing a fee.
Title
Relating to a body worn camera program for certain law enforcement agencies in this state; creating a criminal offense; authorizing a fee.
Sponsors
Sen. Royce West [D] | Sen. Rodney Ellis [D] | Sen. John Whitmire [D] | Rep. Allen Fletcher [R] |
Rep. James White [R] | Rep. Eric Johnson [D] | Rep. Linda Koop [R] | Rep. Ron Reynolds [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-05-25 - House - SB 158Third Reading House (Y: 135 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-19 | Effective on 9/1/15 | |
2015-06-19 | Signed by the Governor | |
2015-05-30 | Sent to the Governor | |
2015-05-30 | House | Signed in the House |
2015-05-30 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2015-05-28 | Senate | Reported enrolled |
2015-05-28 | House | Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported |
2015-05-28 | Senate | Record vote |
2015-05-28 | Senate | Senate concurs in House amendment(s) |
2015-05-28 | Senate | Read |
2015-05-28 | Senate | House amendment(s) laid before the Senate |
2015-05-25 | Senate | House passage as amended reported |
2015-05-25 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2015-05-25 | House | Record vote |
2015-05-25 | House | Passed |
2015-05-25 | House | Read 3rd time |
2015-05-24 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2015-05-24 | House | Passed to 3rd reading as amended |
2015-05-24 | House | Amended |
2015-05-24 | House | Read 2nd time |
2015-05-24 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2015-05-22 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2015-05-21 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2015-05-21 | House | Committee report distributed |
2015-05-20 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2015-05-18 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2015-05-18 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2015-05-18 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2015-05-18 | House | Scheduled for formal meeting on . . . |
2015-05-07 | House | Left pending in committee |
2015-05-07 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2015-05-07 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2015-05-07 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2015-05-04 | House | Posting rule suspended |
2015-05-01 | House | Referred to Emerging Issues In Texas Law Enforcement, Select |
2015-05-01 | House | Read first time |
2015-04-23 | House | Received from the Senate |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Reason for vote recorded in Journal |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Reason for vote recorded in Journal |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Record vote |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Passed |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Record vote |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Record vote |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Amended |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Record vote |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2015-04-20 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2015-04-20 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2015-01-27 | Senate | Referred to Criminal Justice |
2015-01-27 | Senate | Read first time |
2014-11-10 | Senate | Filed |
2014-11-10 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
BILL BLACKWOOD LAW ENFORCEMENT MANAGEMENT INSTITUTE OF TX
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--General
EVIDENCE
Law Enforcement
LAW ENFORCEMENT, TEXAS COMMISSION ON
PUBLIC SAFETY, DEPARTMENT OF
UNIVERSITY OF NORTH TEXAS AT DALLAS
UNIVERSITY OF TEXAS AT DALLAS
VIDEO CAMERAS
W.W. CARUTH JR. POLICE INSTITUTE AT DALLAS
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--General
EVIDENCE
Law Enforcement
LAW ENFORCEMENT, TEXAS COMMISSION ON
PUBLIC SAFETY, DEPARTMENT OF
UNIVERSITY OF NORTH TEXAS AT DALLAS
UNIVERSITY OF TEXAS AT DALLAS
VIDEO CAMERAS
W.W. CARUTH JR. POLICE INSTITUTE AT DALLAS