TX SB1566 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-15 - Effective on 9/1/17
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to certain powers and duties of the board of trustees of an independent school district and the governing body of an open-enrollment charter school and to abolishing certain county boards of education, boards of county school trustees, and offices of county school superintendent.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to certain powers and duties of the board of trustees of an independent school district and the governing body of an open-enrollment charter school and to abolishing certain county boards of education, boards of county school trustees, and offices of county school superintendent.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-27 - Senate - Senate concurs in House amendment(s) (Y: 26 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-24 - House - Amended RV#1729 (Y: 138 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-05-24 - House - RV#1728 (Y: 117 N: 22 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2017-05-24 - House - Amendment tabled RV#1727 (Y: 97 N: 44 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-05-24 - House - Constitutional three day rule suspended RV#1710 (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-05-23 - House - Amended RV#1681 (Y: 123 N: 25 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-23 - House - RV#1680 (Y: 126 N: 21 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-05-23 - House - Rule 4, Section 32(c)(3) and Rule 8, Section 1(a)(1) RV#1679 (Y: 98 N: 46 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-05-23 - House - RV#1678 (Y: 79 N: 65 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-05-23 - House - RV#1677 (Y: 145 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-05-23 - House - 2-Schofield RV#1676 (Y: 102 N: 46 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-15 Effective on 9/1/17
2017-06-15 Signed by the Governor
2017-05-30 Sent to the Governor
2017-05-30HouseSigned in the House
2017-05-30SenateSigned in the Senate
2017-05-29SenateReported enrolled
2017-05-29SenateSenate adopts resolution for tech. correction
2017-05-29HouseHouse adopts resolution for tech. correction
2017-05-28SenateSenate adopts resolution for tech. correction
2017-05-27HouseSenate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported
2017-05-27SenateRecord vote
2017-05-27SenateSenate concurs in House amendment(s)
2017-05-27SenateRead
2017-05-27SenateHouse amendment(s) laid before the Senate
2017-05-24SenateHouse passage as amended reported
2017-05-24HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2017-05-24HouseRecord vote
2017-05-24HousePassed as amended
2017-05-24HouseAmended
2017-05-24HousePoint of order withdrawn
2017-05-24HouseAmendment(s) offered
2017-05-24HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2017-05-24HouseRecord vote
2017-05-24HouseAmended
2017-05-24HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2017-05-24HouseRecord vote
2017-05-24HouseAmendment tabled
2017-05-24HouseAmended
2017-05-24HouseRead 3rd time
2017-05-24HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2017-05-24HouseRecord vote
2017-05-24HouseConstitutional three day rule suspended
2017-05-23HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2017-05-23HouseRecord vote
2017-05-23HousePassed to 3rd reading as amended
2017-05-23HouseAmended
2017-05-23HouseRecord vote
2017-05-23HouseAmended
2017-05-23HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2017-05-23HouseRecord vote
2017-05-23HouseAmended
2017-05-23HousePoint of order overruled
2017-05-23HouseAmendment(s) offered
2017-05-23HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2017-05-23HouseRecord vote
2017-05-23HouseAmended
2017-05-23HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2017-05-23HouseRecord vote
2017-05-23HouseAmended
2017-05-23HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2017-05-23HouseRecord vote
2017-05-23HouseAmended
2017-05-23HouseAmended
2017-05-23HouseAmended
2017-05-23HouseRead 2nd time
2017-05-23HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2017-05-21HouseConsidered in Calendars
2017-05-19HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2017-05-19HouseCommittee report distributed
2017-05-19HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2017-05-17HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2017-05-17HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2017-05-16HouseLeft pending in committee
2017-05-16HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2017-05-16HouseConsidered in public hearing
2017-05-16HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-05-12HousePosting rule suspended
2017-05-12HouseReferred to Public Education
2017-05-12HouseRead first time
2017-04-26HouseReceived from the Senate
2017-04-26SenateReported engrossed
2017-04-26SenateRecord vote
2017-04-26SenatePassed
2017-04-26SenateRead 3rd time
2017-04-26SenateRecord vote
2017-04-26SenateThree day rule suspended
2017-04-26SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-04-26SenateRead 2nd time & passed to engrossment
2017-04-26SenateLaid before the Senate
2017-04-26SenatePlaced on local & uncontested calendar
2017-04-18SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2017-04-18SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2017-04-18SenateReported favorably as substituted
2017-04-11SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-04-04SenateLeft pending in committee
2017-04-04SenateTestimony taken in committee
2017-04-04SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-04-04SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-03-21SenateReferred to Education
2017-03-21SenateRead first time
2017-03-08SenateFiled
2017-03-08SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=SB1566
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/SB01566I.htm
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/SB01566S.htm
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/SB01566E.htm
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/SB01566H.htm
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/SB01566F.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/85r/pdf/85RSJ04-26-F1.PDF#page=4
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=SB1566&RcdVtNo=1676&Ch=H&Dt=05/23/2017
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=SB1566&RcdVtNo=1677&Ch=H&Dt=05/23/2017
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=SB1566&RcdVtNo=1678&Ch=H&Dt=05/23/2017
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=SB1566&RcdVtNo=1679&Ch=H&Dt=05/23/2017
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=SB1566&RcdVtNo=1680&Ch=H&Dt=05/23/2017
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=SB1566&RcdVtNo=1681&Ch=H&Dt=05/23/2017
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=SB1566&RcdVtNo=1710&Ch=H&Dt=05/24/2017
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=SB1566&RcdVtNo=1727&Ch=H&Dt=05/24/2017
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=SB1566&RcdVtNo=1728&Ch=H&Dt=05/24/2017
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=SB1566&RcdVtNo=1729&Ch=H&Dt=05/24/2017
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/85r/pdf/85RSJ05-27-F.PDF#page=39

Bill Comments

feedback