TX SB1557 | 2023-2024 | 88th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 9 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-05-10 - Referred to Public Education
Pending: House Public Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 9 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-05-10 - Referred to Public Education
Pending: House Public Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to providing for an election by the parent of a student who was victimized by a public school employee to transfer the student to another public school campus or receive funding for the student to attend private school.
Title
Relating to providing for an election by the parent of a student who was victimized by a public school employee to transfer the student to another public school campus or receive funding for the student to attend private school.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-09 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-09 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 18 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-04 - Senate - Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment (Y: 18 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-04 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 18 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-09 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 18 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-04 - Senate - Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment (Y: 18 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-04 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 18 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-10 | House | Referred to Public Education |
2023-05-10 | House | Read first time |
2023-05-09 | House | Received from the Senate |
2023-05-09 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2023-05-09 | Senate | Record vote |
2023-05-09 | Senate | Passed |
2023-05-09 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2023-05-09 | Senate | Record vote |
2023-05-09 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2023-05-09 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2023-05-08 | Senate | Not again placed on intent calendar |
2023-05-04 | Senate | Record vote |
2023-05-04 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2023-05-04 | Senate | Record vote |
2023-05-04 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2023-05-04 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2023-05-02 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2023-04-27 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2023-04-27 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2023-04-27 | Senate | Vote taken in committee |
2023-04-27 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2023-04-19 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2023-04-19 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2023-04-19 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2023-04-19 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2023-03-16 | Senate | Referred to Education |
2023-03-16 | Senate | Read first time |
2023-03-03 | Senate | Filed |
2023-03-03 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
Education
EDUCATION, COMMISSIONER OF
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Admission & Attendance
Education--Primary & Secondary--Finance
Education--Primary & Secondary--Other School Personnel
Education--Primary & Secondary--Teachers
Family
Family--Parent & Child
Minors
Minors--Crimes Against
Minors--Health & Safety
EDUCATION, COMMISSIONER OF
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Admission & Attendance
Education--Primary & Secondary--Finance
Education--Primary & Secondary--Other School Personnel
Education--Primary & Secondary--Teachers
Family
Family--Parent & Child
Minors
Minors--Crimes Against
Minors--Health & Safety