TX SB1557 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 9 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-09 - Effective on 1/1/18
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the administration of gasoline and diesel fuel motor fuels taxes and the fee on the delivery of certain petroleum products.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the administration of gasoline and diesel fuel motor fuels taxes and the fee on the delivery of certain petroleum products.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-24 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1761 (Y: 141 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-05-24 - House - Constitutional three day rule suspended RV#1710 (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-04-03 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-03 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-09 Effective on 1/1/18
2017-06-09 Signed by the Governor
2017-05-26 Sent to the Governor
2017-05-26HouseSigned in the House
2017-05-25SenateSigned in the Senate
2017-05-24SenateReported enrolled
2017-05-24SenateHouse passage reported
2017-05-24HouseRecord vote
2017-05-24HousePassed
2017-05-24HouseRead 3rd time
2017-05-24HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2017-05-24HouseRecord vote
2017-05-24HouseConstitutional three day rule suspended
2017-05-23HousePassed to 3rd reading
2017-05-23HouseRead 2nd time
2017-05-23HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2017-05-21HouseConsidered in Calendars
2017-05-20HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2017-05-19HouseCommittee report distributed
2017-05-19HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2017-05-18HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2017-05-18HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2017-05-15HouseReferred to Ways & Means
2017-05-15HouseRead first time
2017-04-04HouseReceived from the Senate
2017-04-03SenateReported engrossed
2017-04-03SenateRecord vote
2017-04-03SenatePassed
2017-04-03SenateRead 3rd time
2017-04-03SenateRecord vote
2017-04-03SenateThree day rule suspended
2017-04-03SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-04-03SenateRead 2nd time & passed to engrossment
2017-04-03SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2017-03-30SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2017-03-29SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2017-03-29SenateReported favorably as substituted
2017-03-27SenateTestimony taken in committee
2017-03-27SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-03-27SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-03-21SenateReferred to Finance
2017-03-21SenateRead first time
2017-03-08SenateFiled
2017-03-08SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=SB1557
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/SB01557I.htm
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/SB01557S.htm
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/SB01557E.htm
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/SB01557H.htm
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/SB01557F.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/85r/pdf/85RSJ04-03-F.PDF#page=11
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/85r/pdf/85RSJ04-03-F.PDF#page=12
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=SB1557&RcdVtNo=1710&Ch=H&Dt=05/24/2017
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=SB1557&RcdVtNo=1761&Ch=H&Dt=05/24/2017

Bill Comments

feedback