TX SB1554 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 27 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-27 - Effective immediately
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 27 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-27 - Effective immediately
Summary
Relating to the authority of officers in certain counties to designate a person to receive fees, commissions, or costs.
Title
Relating to the authority of officers in certain counties to designate a person to receive fees, commissions, or costs.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-27 | Effective immediately | |
2009-05-27 | Signed by the Governor | |
2009-05-19 | Sent to the Governor | |
2009-05-19 | Signed in the House | |
2009-05-19 | Signed in the Senate | |
2009-05-18 | Reported enrolled | |
2009-05-18 | House passage reported | |
2009-05-15 | Record vote | |
2009-05-15 | Passed | |
2009-05-15 | Read 3rd time | |
2009-05-15 | Passed to 3rd reading | |
2009-05-15 | Read 2nd time | |
2009-05-15 | Laid out in lieu of companion | |
2009-05-15 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | |
2009-05-15 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-05-15 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2009-05-12 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | |
2009-05-12 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | |
2009-05-12 | Considered in formal meeting | |
2009-05-11 | No action taken in committee | |
2009-05-07 | Posting rule suspended | |
2009-04-30 | Referred to County Affairs | |
2009-04-30 | Read first time | |
2009-04-23 | Received from the Senate | |
2009-04-22 | Reported engrossed | |
2009-04-22 | Record vote | |
2009-04-22 | Passed | |
2009-04-22 | Read 3rd time | |
2009-04-22 | Record vote | |
2009-04-22 | Three day rule suspended | |
2009-04-22 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-04-22 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | |
2009-04-22 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | |
2009-04-21 | Placed on intent calendar | |
2009-04-17 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-04-17 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | |
2009-04-17 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | |
2009-04-15 | Testimony taken in committee | |
2009-04-15 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-04-15 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-03-17 | Referred to Intergovernmental Relations | |
2009-03-17 | Read first time | |
2009-03-09 | Filed | |
2009-03-09 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB3730 (Same As) 2009-05-15 - Laid on the table subject to call
Subjects
County Government
County Government--Employees/Officers
Fees & Other Nontax Revenue
Fees & Other Nontax Revenue--Local
County Government--Employees/Officers
Fees & Other Nontax Revenue
Fees & Other Nontax Revenue--Local