TX SB1553 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on June 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-15 - See remarks for effective date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to certain requirements imposed on a sex offender who enters the premises of a school and to the refusal of entry to or ejection from school district property.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to certain requirements imposed on a sex offender who enters the premises of a school and to the refusal of entry to or ejection from school district property.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-28 - Senate - Senate adopts conference committee report (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-05-28 - House - House adopts conference committee report RV#2011 (Y: 132 N: 13 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-05-24 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1722 (Y: 138 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-05-24 - House - Constitutional three day rule suspended RV#1710 (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-05-15 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 29 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-15 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 29 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-15 See remarks for effective date
2017-06-15 Signed by the Governor
2017-05-30 Sent to the Governor
2017-05-29HouseSigned in the House
2017-05-29SenateSigned in the Senate
2017-05-29SenateReported enrolled
2017-05-28HouseSenate adopts conf. comm. report-reported
2017-05-28SenateRecord vote
2017-05-28SenateSenate adopts conference committee report
2017-05-28SenateHouse adopts conf. comm. report-reported
2017-05-28HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2017-05-28HouseRecord vote
2017-05-28HouseHouse adopts conference committee report
2017-05-27HouseConf. Comm. Report distributed
2017-05-27SenateConference committee report filed
2017-05-27SenateHouse appoints conferees-reported
2017-05-27SenateHouse grants request for conf comm-reported
2017-05-27HouseHouse appoints conferees
2017-05-27HouseHouse grants request for conference committee
2017-05-27HouseSenate appoints conferees-reported
2017-05-27HouseSenate requests conference committee-reported
2017-05-27HouseSenate refuses to concur-reported
2017-05-26SenateSenate appoints conferees
2017-05-26SenateSenate requests conference committee
2017-05-26SenateSenate refuses to concur
2017-05-26SenateRead
2017-05-26SenateHouse amendment(s) laid before the Senate
2017-05-24SenateHouse passage as amended reported
2017-05-24HouseRecord vote
2017-05-24HousePassed
2017-05-24HouseRead 3rd time
2017-05-24HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2017-05-24HouseRecord vote
2017-05-24HouseConstitutional three day rule suspended
2017-05-23HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2017-05-23HousePassed to 3rd reading as amended
2017-05-23HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2017-05-23HouseAmended
2017-05-23HouseRead 2nd time
2017-05-23HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2017-05-20HouseConsidered in Calendars
2017-05-20HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2017-05-20HouseCommittee report distributed
2017-05-19HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2017-05-19HouseReported favorably as substituted
2017-05-19HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2017-05-19HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2017-05-19HouseScheduled for formal meeting on . . .
2017-05-16HouseReferred to Public Education
2017-05-16HouseRead first time
2017-05-15HouseReceived from the Senate
2017-05-15SenateReported engrossed
2017-05-15SenateRecord vote
2017-05-15SenatePassed
2017-05-15SenateRead 3rd time
2017-05-15SenateRecord vote
2017-05-15SenateThree day rule suspended
2017-05-15SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-05-15SenatePassed to engrossment as amended
2017-05-15SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-05-15SenateAmended
2017-05-15SenateAmendment(s) offered
2017-05-15SenateRead 2nd time
2017-05-15SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-05-15SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2017-05-15SenateCo-author authorized
2017-05-11SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2017-05-11SenateCo-author authorized
2017-05-10SenateCo-author authorized
2017-05-09SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2017-05-09SenateReported favorably as substituted
2017-05-04SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-04-27SenateLeft pending in committee
2017-04-27SenateTestimony taken in committee
2017-04-27SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-04-27SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-03-21SenateReferred to Education
2017-03-21SenateRead first time
2017-03-08SenateFiled
2017-03-08SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=SB1553
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/SB01553I.htm
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/SB01553S.htm
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/SB01553E.htm
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/SB01553H.htm
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/SB01553F.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=SB1553&RcdVtNo=1710&Ch=H&Dt=05/24/2017
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=SB1553&RcdVtNo=1722&Ch=H&Dt=05/24/2017
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/85r/pdf/85RSJ05-15-F.PDF#page=10
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=SB1553&RcdVtNo=2011&Ch=H&Dt=05/28/2017
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/85r/pdf/85RSJ05-28-F.PDF#page=69

Bill Comments

feedback