TX SB1539 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 5 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-26 - House appoints conferees-reported
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 5 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-26 - House appoints conferees-reported
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the application of the sales and use tax to certain property and services.
Title
Relating to the application of the sales and use tax to certain property and services.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-19 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1358 (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-26 | Senate | House appoints conferees-reported |
2017-05-26 | Senate | House grants request for conf comm-reported |
2017-05-26 | House | House appoints conferees |
2017-05-26 | House | House grants request for conference committee |
2017-05-25 | House | Senate appoints conferees-reported |
2017-05-25 | House | Senate requests conference committee-reported |
2017-05-25 | House | Senate refuses to concur-reported |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Senate appoints conferees |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Senate requests conference committee |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Senate refuses to concur |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Read |
2017-05-25 | Senate | House amendment(s) laid before the Senate |
2017-05-21 | Senate | House passage as amended reported |
2017-05-19 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-19 | House | Record vote |
2017-05-19 | House | Passed |
2017-05-19 | House | Read 3rd time |
2017-05-19 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-19 | House | Passed to 3rd reading as amended |
2017-05-19 | House | Amended |
2017-05-19 | House | Read 2nd time |
2017-05-19 | House | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar |
2017-05-16 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2017-05-05 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2017-05-05 | House | Committee report distributed |
2017-05-05 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2017-04-27 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2017-04-27 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2017-04-27 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2017-04-27 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-18 | House | Referred to Ways & Means |
2017-04-18 | House | Read first time |
2017-04-06 | House | Received from the Senate |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Passed |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Not again placed on intent calendar |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Referred to Finance |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Read first time |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Filed |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
Amusements, Games, Sports
Property Interests
Property Interests--Personal Property
Taxation
Taxation--Sales
Property Interests
Property Interests--Personal Property
Taxation
Taxation--Sales