TX SB1537 | 2013-2014 | 83rd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 18 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-18 - Effective on . . . . . . . . . . . . . . .
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 18 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-18 - Effective on . . . . . . . . . . . . . . .
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to certain required notices under the Texas Unemployment Compensation Act, including employer liability arising from failure to provide the notice.
Title
Relating to certain required notices under the Texas Unemployment Compensation Act, including employer liability arising from failure to provide the notice.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-02 - House - SB 1537Third Reading House (Y: 147 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-18 | Effective on . . . . . . . . . . . . . . . | |
2013-05-18 | Signed by the Governor | |
2013-05-07 | Sent to the Governor | |
2013-05-06 | House | Signed in the House |
2013-05-06 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2013-05-03 | Senate | Reported enrolled |
2013-05-03 | Senate | House passage reported |
2013-05-02 | House | Record vote |
2013-05-02 | House | Passed |
2013-05-02 | House | Read 3rd time |
2013-05-02 | House | Passed to 3rd reading |
2013-05-02 | House | Read 2nd time |
2013-05-02 | House | Laid out in lieu of companion |
2013-04-26 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2013-04-26 | House | Committee report distributed |
2013-04-25 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2013-04-24 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2013-04-24 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2013-04-24 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2013-04-15 | House | Referred to Economic & Small Business Development |
2013-04-15 | House | Read first time |
2013-04-11 | House | Received from the Senate |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Record vote |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Passed |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Record vote |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Laid before the Senate |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2013-03-28 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2013-03-28 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2013-03-28 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2013-03-27 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2013-03-27 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2013-03-27 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Referred to Economic Development |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Read first time |
2013-03-08 | Senate | Filed |
2013-03-08 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |