TX SB1530 | 2015-2016 | 84th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 30 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-08 - Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the offense of leaving a motor vehicle unattended.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the offense of leaving a motor vehicle unattended.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2015-05-08HouseComm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
2015-05-07HouseCommittee report distributed
2015-05-07HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2015-05-07HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2015-05-07HouseRecommended to be sent to Local & Consent
2015-05-07HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2015-05-04HouseReferred to Transportation
2015-05-04HouseRead first time
2015-04-30HouseReceived from the Senate
2015-04-30SenateReported engrossed
2015-04-30SenateRecord vote
2015-04-30SenatePassed
2015-04-30SenateRead 3rd time
2015-04-30SenateRecord vote
2015-04-30SenateThree day rule suspended
2015-04-30SenateVote recorded in Journal
2015-04-30SenateRead 2nd time & passed to engrossment
2015-04-30SenateVote recorded in Journal
2015-04-30SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2015-04-30SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2015-04-29SenateNot again placed on intent calendar
2015-04-28SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2015-04-23SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2015-04-23SenateReported favorably as substituted
2015-04-22SenateConsidered in public hearing
2015-04-15SenateLeft pending in committee
2015-04-15SenateConsidered in public hearing
2015-04-15SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2015-03-23SenateReferred to Transportation
2015-03-23SenateRead first time
2015-03-12SenateFiled
2015-03-12SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback