TX SB1521 | 2011-2012 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-17 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-17 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the distribution of money appropriated from a municipal court building security fund.
Title
Relating to the distribution of money appropriated from a municipal court building security fund.
Sponsors
Rep. Jose Aliseda [R] | Rep. Joaquin Castro [D] | Rep. Pete Gallego [D] | Rep. John Garza [R] |
Rep. Will Hartnett [R] | Rep. Eddie Rodriguez [D] | Sen. Carlos Uresti [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-17 | Effective immediately | |
2011-06-17 | Signed by the Governor | |
2011-05-26 | Sent to the Governor | |
2011-05-26 | Signed in the House | |
2011-05-25 | Signed in the Senate | |
2011-05-23 | Reported enrolled | |
2011-05-23 | House passage reported | |
2011-05-23 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-05-23 | Record vote | |
2011-05-23 | Passed | |
2011-05-23 | Read 3rd time | |
2011-05-23 | Record vote | |
2011-05-23 | Constitutional three day rule suspended | |
2011-05-23 | Passed to 3rd reading | |
2011-05-23 | Read 2nd time | |
2011-05-23 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | |
2011-05-21 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | |
2011-05-20 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | |
2011-05-20 | Committee report distributed | |
2011-05-20 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2011-05-18 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | |
2011-05-18 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | |
2011-05-18 | Considered in formal meeting | |
2011-05-10 | No action taken in committee | |
2011-04-26 | Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence | |
2011-04-26 | Read first time | |
2011-04-21 | Received from the Senate | |
2011-04-21 | Reported engrossed | |
2011-04-21 | Record vote | |
2011-04-21 | Passed | |
2011-04-21 | Read 3rd time | |
2011-04-21 | Record vote | |
2011-04-21 | Three day rule suspended | |
2011-04-21 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-04-21 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | |
2011-04-21 | Laid before the Senate | |
2011-04-21 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | |
2011-04-20 | Not again placed on intent calendar | |
2011-04-19 | Placed on intent calendar | |
2011-04-18 | Not again placed on intent calendar | |
2011-04-14 | Placed on intent calendar | |
2011-04-06 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2011-04-06 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | |
2011-04-06 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | |
2011-04-05 | Testimony taken in committee | |
2011-04-05 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-04-05 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-03-22 | Referred to Jurisprudence | |
2011-03-22 | Read first time | |
2011-03-10 | Filed | |
2011-03-10 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |