TX SB151 | 2013-2014 | 83rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Introduced on December 21 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-25 - Co-author authorized
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 21 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-25 - Co-author authorized
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the practice of dentistry, including the regulation of dental service organizations; providing an administrative penalty.
Title
Relating to the practice of dentistry, including the regulation of dental service organizations; providing an administrative penalty.
Sponsors
Sen. Jane Nelson [R] | Sen. Joan Huffman [R] | Sen. Jose Rodriguez [D] | Sen. Royce West [D] |
Sen. Donna Campbell [R] | Sen. John Carona [R] | Sen. Kevin Eltife [R] | Sen. Charles Schwertner [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-25 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2013-01-29 | Senate | Referred to Health & Human Services |
2013-01-29 | Senate | Read first time |
2013-01-23 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2012-12-21 | Senate | Filed |
2012-12-21 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
DENTAL EXAMINERS, STATE BOARD OF
DENTAL SERVICES
DENTISTS & DENTISTRY
Occupational Regulation
Occupational Regulation--Health Occupations
DENTAL SERVICES
DENTISTS & DENTISTRY
Occupational Regulation
Occupational Regulation--Health Occupations
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=83R&Bill=SB151 |
Text | http://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/83R/billtext/html/SB00151I.htm |