TX SB150 | 2015-2016 | 84th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on November 10 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-13 - Not again placed on intent calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 10 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-13 - Not again placed on intent calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to authorizing the issuance of revenue bonds to fund capital projects at public institutions of higher education.
Title
Relating to authorizing the issuance of revenue bonds to fund capital projects at public institutions of higher education.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-13 | Senate | Not again placed on intent calendar |
2015-04-13 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2015-04-08 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2015-04-01 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2015-04-01 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2015-04-01 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2015-01-27 | Senate | Referred to Higher Education |
2015-01-27 | Senate | Read first time |
2014-11-10 | Senate | Filed |
2014-11-10 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
BONDS
Education
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--Finance
Education--Higher--Institutions & Programs
MIDWESTERN STATE UNIVERSITY
State Finances
State Finances--Appropriations
State Finances--Budget
State Finances--Management & Control
STEPHEN F. AUSTIN STATE UNIVERSITY
TEXAS A&M UNIVERSITY SYSTEM
TEXAS SOUTHERN UNIVERSITY
TEXAS STATE TECHNICAL COLLEGE SYSTEM
TEXAS STATE UNIVERSITY SYSTEM
TEXAS TECH UNIVERSITY SYSTEM
TEXAS WOMAN'S UNIVERSITY
UNIVERSITY OF HOUSTON SYSTEM
UNIVERSITY OF NORTH TEXAS SYSTEM
UNIVERSITY OF TEXAS SYSTEM
Education
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--Finance
Education--Higher--Institutions & Programs
MIDWESTERN STATE UNIVERSITY
State Finances
State Finances--Appropriations
State Finances--Budget
State Finances--Management & Control
STEPHEN F. AUSTIN STATE UNIVERSITY
TEXAS A&M UNIVERSITY SYSTEM
TEXAS SOUTHERN UNIVERSITY
TEXAS STATE TECHNICAL COLLEGE SYSTEM
TEXAS STATE UNIVERSITY SYSTEM
TEXAS TECH UNIVERSITY SYSTEM
TEXAS WOMAN'S UNIVERSITY
UNIVERSITY OF HOUSTON SYSTEM
UNIVERSITY OF NORTH TEXAS SYSTEM
UNIVERSITY OF TEXAS SYSTEM