TX SB1493 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-20 - Left pending in committee
Pending: Senate Business & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-20 - Left pending in committee
Pending: Senate Business & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to prohibiting certain limitations on the operation of certain organizations that benefit veterans during a declared state of disaster.
Title
Relating to prohibiting certain limitations on the operation of certain organizations that benefit veterans during a declared state of disaster.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-20 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Referred to Business & Commerce |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Read first time |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Filed |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB4215 (Same As) 2021-03-29 - Referred to State Affairs
HB4215 (Same As) 2021-03-29 - Referred to State Affairs
HB4215 (Same As) 2021-03-29 - Referred to State Affairs