TX SB1472 | 2011-2012 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 29 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-05-02 - Referred to Economic & Small Business Development
Pending: House Economic & Small Business Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 29 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-05-02 - Referred to Economic & Small Business Development
Pending: House Economic & Small Business Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the coordinated dissemination of online information regarding the operation and performance of certain for-profit educational entities.
Title
Relating to the coordinated dissemination of online information regarding the operation and performance of certain for-profit educational entities.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-02 | Referred to Economic & Small Business Development | |
2011-05-02 | Read first time | |
2011-05-02 | Received from the Senate | |
2011-04-29 | Reported engrossed | |
2011-04-29 | Record vote | |
2011-04-29 | Passed | |
2011-04-29 | Read 3rd time | |
2011-04-29 | Record vote | |
2011-04-29 | Three day rule suspended | |
2011-04-29 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-04-29 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | |
2011-04-29 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-04-29 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | |
2011-04-28 | Placed on intent calendar | |
2011-04-26 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2011-04-26 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | |
2011-04-26 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2011-04-20 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-04-06 | Left pending in committee | |
2011-04-06 | Testimony taken in committee | |
2011-04-06 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-04-06 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-03-22 | Referred to Economic Development | |
2011-03-22 | Read first time | |
2011-03-10 | Filed | |
2011-03-10 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
Education
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--State Coordination
Education--Nonpublic Schools
Education--Nonpublic Schools--Vocational/Avocational
EMAIL & ELECTRONIC COMMUNICATIONS
INTERNET
Labor
Labor--Workforce Development
WORKFORCE COMMISSION, TEXAS
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--State Coordination
Education--Nonpublic Schools
Education--Nonpublic Schools--Vocational/Avocational
EMAIL & ELECTRONIC COMMUNICATIONS
INTERNET
Labor
Labor--Workforce Development
WORKFORCE COMMISSION, TEXAS