TX SB147 | 2023-2024 | 88th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 26 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-05-04 - Referred to State Affairs
Pending: House State Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 26 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-05-04 - Referred to State Affairs
Pending: House State Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the purchase of or acquisition of title to real property by certain aliens or foreign entities.
Title
Relating to the purchase of or acquisition of title to real property by certain aliens or foreign entities.
Sponsors
Sen. Lois Kolkhorst [R] | Sen. Paul Bettencourt [R] | Sen. Charles Creighton [R] | Sen. Bob Hall [R] |
Sen. Juan Hinojosa [D] | Sen. Mayes Middleton [R] | Sen. Drew Springer [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-04-26 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-26 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 19 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-25 - Senate - Vote recorded in Journal (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-25 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 18 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-26 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 19 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-25 - Senate - Vote recorded in Journal (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-25 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 18 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-04 | House | Referred to State Affairs |
2023-05-04 | House | Read first time |
2023-04-27 | House | Received from the Senate |
2023-04-26 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2023-04-26 | Senate | Remarks ordered printed |
2023-04-26 | Senate | Record vote |
2023-04-26 | Senate | Passed |
2023-04-26 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2023-04-26 | Senate | Record vote |
2023-04-26 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2023-04-26 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2023-04-25 | Senate | Remarks ordered printed |
2023-04-25 | Senate | Record vote |
2023-04-25 | Senate | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2023-04-25 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2023-04-25 | Senate | Amended |
2023-04-25 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered FA3 Kolkhorst |
2023-04-25 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2023-04-25 | Senate | Amended |
2023-04-25 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered FA2 Kolkhorst |
2023-04-25 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2023-04-25 | Senate | Amended |
2023-04-25 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered FA1 Kolkhorst |
2023-04-25 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2023-04-25 | Senate | Record vote |
2023-04-25 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2023-04-18 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2023-04-13 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2023-04-13 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2023-04-06 | Senate | Vote taken in committee |
2023-04-06 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2023-03-02 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2023-03-02 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2023-03-02 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2023-03-02 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2023-03-01 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2023-02-21 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2023-02-15 | Senate | Referred to State Affairs |
2023-02-15 | Senate | Read first time |
2023-02-14 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2022-11-14 | Senate | Filed |
2022-11-14 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
Aliens
INTERNATIONAL RELATIONS
Property Interests
Property Interests--Homestead
Property Interests--Real Property
SECRETARY OF STATE
INTERNATIONAL RELATIONS
Property Interests
Property Interests--Homestead
Property Interests--Real Property
SECRETARY OF STATE