TX SB1468 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 10 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-22 - Left pending in committee
Pending: Senate Natural Resources & Economic Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 10 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-22 - Left pending in committee
Pending: Senate Natural Resources & Economic Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to oil and gas liens.
Title
Relating to oil and gas liens.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-22 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Referred to Natural Resources & Economic Development |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Read first time |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Filed |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB3794 (Same As) 2021-06-04 - Effective on 9/1/21
Subjects
Business & Commerce
Business & Commerce--General
Oil & Gas
Property Interests
Property Interests--Mortgages & Liens
Business & Commerce--General
Oil & Gas
Property Interests
Property Interests--Mortgages & Liens