TX SB1467 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 1 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-05-17 - House passage as amended reported
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the Texas college work-study program and to establishing a program for the off-campus employment of certain students at public or private institutions of higher education.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the Texas college work-study program and to establishing a program for the off-campus employment of certain students at public or private institutions of higher education.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-16 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1267 (Y: 107 N: 35 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-05-11 - House - Postponed RV#1204 (Y: 118 N: 20 NV: 1 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2017-05-01 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 26 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-01 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 26 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-01 - Senate - Vote recorded in Journal (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-05-01 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-17SenateHouse passage as amended reported
2017-05-16HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2017-05-16HouseRecord vote
2017-05-16HousePassed
2017-05-16HouseRead 3rd time
2017-05-15HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2017-05-15HousePassed to 3rd reading as amended
2017-05-15HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2017-05-15HouseAmended
2017-05-15HouseAmendment withdrawn
2017-05-15HouseLaid out as postponed business
2017-05-12HousePostponed
2017-05-12HouseLaid out as postponed business
2017-05-11HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2017-05-11HouseRecord vote
2017-05-11HousePostponed
2017-05-11HouseRead 2nd time
2017-05-11HouseLaid out in lieu of companion
2017-05-11HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2017-05-11HouseCommittee report distributed
2017-05-10HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2017-05-10HouseReported favorably as substituted
2017-05-10HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2017-05-10HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2017-05-08HouseReferred to Higher Education
2017-05-08HouseRead first time
2017-05-02HouseReceived from the Senate
2017-05-01SenateReported engrossed
2017-05-01SenateRecord vote
2017-05-01SenatePassed
2017-05-01SenateRead 3rd time
2017-05-01SenateRecord vote
2017-05-01SenateThree day rule suspended
2017-05-01SenateRecord vote
2017-05-01SenatePassed to engrossment as amended
2017-05-01SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-05-01SenateAmended
2017-05-01SenateAmendment(s) offered
2017-05-01SenateRead 2nd time
2017-05-01SenateRecord vote
2017-05-01SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2017-04-26SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2017-04-19SenateRemoved from local & uncontested calendar
2017-04-19SenatePlaced on local & uncontested calendar
2017-04-06SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2017-04-06SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2017-04-06SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2017-04-05SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-03-29SenateLeft pending in committee
2017-03-29SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-03-29SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-03-20SenateReferred to Higher Education
2017-03-20SenateRead first time
2017-03-08SenateFiled
2017-03-08SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=SB1467
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/SB01467I.htm
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/SB01467S.htm
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/SB01467E.htm
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/SB01467H.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/85r/pdf/85RSJ05-01-F.PDF#page=168
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/85r/pdf/85RSJ05-01-F.PDF#page=169
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=SB1467&RcdVtNo=1204&Ch=H&Dt=05/11/2017
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=SB1467&RcdVtNo=1267&Ch=H&Dt=05/16/2017

Bill Comments

feedback