TX SB1460 | 2013-2014 | 83rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 25 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-04-30 - Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence
Pending: House Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 25 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-04-30 - Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence
Pending: House Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to appointment of a bailiff to serve the 105th District Court.
Title
Relating to appointment of a bailiff to serve the 105th District Court.
Sponsors
Sen. Eddie Lucio [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-30 | House | Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence |
2013-04-30 | House | Read first time |
2013-04-25 | House | Received from the Senate |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Record vote |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Passed |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Record vote |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Laid before the Senate |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2013-04-09 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2013-04-09 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2013-04-09 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2013-03-18 | Senate | Referred to Jurisprudence |
2013-03-18 | Senate | Read first time |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Filed |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |